Dogfen lywodraethu WEST BERKSHIRE TRAINING CONSORTIUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 AUG 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS (INCLUDING THE EDUCATION OF UNEMPLOYED YOUNG PERSONS), THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE, VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, APPRENTICESHIPS AND OTHER SERVICES AS WOULD ENABLE PERSONS TO ACQUIRE SKILLS TO SECURE EMPLOYMENT OR ADVANCE THEIR CAREERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.