Dogfen lywodraethu THE SWINDON U3A

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/02/1988 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/1992 AS AMENDED ON 13/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 14 OCT 2019 as amended on 14 Oct 2019 as amended on 06 Dec 2021 as amended on 13 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL-TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT IN SWINDON AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Maes buddion
THAMESDOWN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.