Dogfen lywodraethu TANGMERE MILITARY AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 299327

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30TH MARCH 1996, 31ST MARCH, 23 APRIL 2005 AND 26TH FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE CONSTRUCTION AND PROVISION OF A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS RELATED TO AVIATION AND AVIATION HISTORY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.