Dogfen lywodraethu THE LONDON EARLY YEARS FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2017 as amended on 02 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND UPBRINGING AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN PARTICULARLY THOSE WHOSE CIRCUMSTANCES MAKE IT NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE FOR THEM TO BE CARED FOR OUTSIDE THE NORMAL HOME ENVIRONMENT; AND 2.2 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING IN RESPECT OF ALL MATTERS RELATING TO CHILD CARE, THE UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND THE PROTECTION AND HEALTH OF CHILDREN.
Maes buddion
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.