Dogfen lywodraethu YOUTH HOSTELS ASSOCIATION (ENGLAND AND WALES)
Rhif yr elusen: 301657
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1933 AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 1976, 9 APRIL 1983, 9 NOVEMBER 1985, 5 APRIL 1986, 16 APRIL 1988 AND 17 SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 13 NOVEMBER 1998 AND 22ND SEPTEMBER 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO HELP ALL, ESPECIALLY YOUNG PEOPLE OF LIMITED MEANS TO A GREATER KNOWLEDGE, LOVE AND CARE OF THE COUNTRYSIDE, PARTICULARLY PROVIDING HOSTELS OR OTHER SIMPLE ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM IN THEIR TRAVELS: AND THUS TO PROMOTE THEIR HEALTH, REST AND EDUCATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.