Dogfen lywodraethu WILTSHIRE CITIZENS ADVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20/08/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 OCT 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 18 Oct 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN WILTSHIRE AND THE DISTRICT OF SWINDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
NORTH WILTSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.