Dogfen lywodraethu WINCHESTER HOUSING TRUST LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 1061855

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 NOV 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2018 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEB 2020 as amended on 08 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are the provision of low cost housing for sale, shared ownership or disposal by any other means or for rent or occupation by licence or otherwise within the South of England
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.