STONEHOUSE CREEK COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote community development in the area of Stonehouse.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Dinas Plymouth
Llywodraethu
- 11 Medi 1997: Cofrestrwyd
- 07 Tachwedd 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- SCCDT (Enw gwaith)
- STONEHOUSE CREEK TRUST (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £313.08k | £246.22k | £96.56k | £117.06k | £133.07k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £341.29k | £273.37k | £89.35k | £111.06k | £118.87k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 23 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 23 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 28 Rhagfyr 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 28 Rhagfyr 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1997
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STONEHOUSE (ST PETER WARD) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH PLAYGROUPS. (D) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR SECTIONS OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING INDIVIDUAL COMMUNITIES DEFINED BY THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS IN WHICH THEY LIVE OR WORK OR THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINS) AS THE COMPANY SHALL THINK FIT. [PROVIDED THAT IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST ACTIVITIES OUTSIDE THE AREA REFERRED TO ABOVE WHERE IT IS OF THE OPINION THAT TO DO SO WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA]
Maes buddion
STONEHOUSE (ST PETER WARD) AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window