Dogfen lywodraethu BACKWELL PLAYING FIELDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 09/06/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/08/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/02/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BACKWELL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE PROVISION, ON THE SAID RECREATION GROUND OR ANY PART THEREOF OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF BACKWELL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.