Dogfen lywodraethu AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1960 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 AUG 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND UNDERTAKE RESEARCH IN HEALTH SCIENCES, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY DISCIPLINES. (B) TO ESTABLISH TREATMENT CENTRES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASE AND MAINTENANCE OF HEALTH BY THE APPLICATION OF ANY HEALTH SCIENCES DISCIPLINE, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY TREATMENTS. (C) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH SCIENCES, INCLUDING CHIROPRACTIC AND/OR OTHER ALLIED, RELATED OR ANCILLARY DISCIPLINES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.