DYKE EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Foundation makes awards to students who are undertaking courses in Further Education. The awards are made to assist with fees, accommodation, purchase of books and equipment, or any other expense incurred by the student. Applicants must be resident in Somerset, Devon or Cornwall.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Cernyw
- Dyfnaint
- Gwlad Yr Haf
Llywodraethu
- 24 Ionawr 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1094446 SOMERSET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- 15 Hydref 1962: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Rhagfyr 2010: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- 03 Hydref 2011: Re-registered
- 24 Ionawr 2020: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddsoddi
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.37k | £4.63k | £3.53k | £2.94k | £2.42k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.75k | £2.83k | £3.48k | £5.34k | £5.30k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2018 | 11 Mehefin 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2017 | 12 Mehefin 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2016 | 25 Ebrill 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2016 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1983
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES. IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST BENEFICIARIES TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR CALLING ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. PROVIDED THAT AWARDS CONSISTING OF THE PAYMENT OF PART PAYMENT OF FEES SHALL BE CALLED DYKE EXHIBITIONS AND THAT A PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE,OR ARE ABOUT TO BECOME UNDERGRADUATES OF OXFORD UNIVERSITY.
Maes buddion
COUNTIES OF CORNWALL, DEVON AND SOMERSET AS CONSTITUTED ON 31 MARCH 1974.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window