Dogfen lywodraethu BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
WILL PROVED 17 AUGUST 1883 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 12 OCTOBER 1897, 2 MAY 1922 AND 5 MAY 1970 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG MEN UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE SONS OF CLERGY IN THE DIOCESE OF EXETER AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL AID. ASSISTANCE MAY BE GIVEN IN THE FORM OF SCHOLARSHIPS,GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE AT ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT;OR FOR TRAVEL FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES;OR FOR STUDY OF THE ARTS OR MUSIC;OR FOR SOCIAL OR PHYSICAL EDUCATION.N THIS CLAUSE THE EXPRESSION "BENEFICIARIES" MEANS BOYS, GIRLS, YOUNG MEN AND YOUNG WOMEN WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO ARE THE SONS OR DAUGHTERS OF THE CLERGY OF THE DIOCESE OF EXETER AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE."(FOR FULL DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 5TH MAY 1970)
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF EXETER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.