Dogfen lywodraethu FARNEY CLOSE SCHOOL LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1954, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 13 MAY 1995, 20 MAY 2000 AND 10 JULY 2021 as amended on 13 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity (Objects) are to promote and provide for the advancement of education and in connection therewith, to conduct, carry on, organise and develop in the United Kingdom any boarding or day school or schools for the education of children of either or both sexes but so that each such school shall be carried on as an educational charity.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.