Dogfen lywodraethu OATES MEMORIAL LIBRARY AND MUSEUM AND THE GILBERT WHITE MUSEUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 07/02/1994 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 11/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2007 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/03/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, (A) BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM AND LIBRARY; AND (B) BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF: (I) THE HOUSE KNOWN AS “THE WAKES” IN SELBORNE, HAMPSHIRE TOGETHER WITH ITS ANCILLARY BUILDINGS, GARDENS AND PARK OR SUCH PARTS THEREOF AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE HELD BY THE CHARITY; AND (II) THE GILBERT WHITE AND CAPTAIN LAWRENCE AND FRANK OATES’ COLLECTIONS OF NATURAL HISTORY AND OTHER EXHIBITS, BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS; (2) THE SAID LAND AND BUILDINGS AND THE COLLECTION OF EXHIBITS, BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS REFERRED TO IN THE SAID SCHEDULE SHALL BE APPROPRIATED AND USED FOR THE SAID OBJECT.
Maes buddion
SELBORNE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.