Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY ACTION EPPING FOREST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2015 as amended on 17 Nov 2020 as amended on 24 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF EPPING FOREST AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF EPPING FOREST AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.