Dogfen lywodraethu THE PREBENDAL SCHOOL
Rhif yr elusen: 307370

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DEAN BURGEN'S STATUTE OF MAY 1880 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MARCH 1979, SCHEME DATED 12 JULY 1984, RESOLUTION DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2000, SCHEME DATED 17 DECEMBER 2003, RESOLUTION DATED 15 NOVEMBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A BOYS AND GIRLS' PREPARATORY BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL GIVING RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL INSTRUCTION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.