Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHAMPTONSHIRE DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 OCT 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 MAY 2017 as amended on 14 Dec 2022 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS AFFECTED BY DOMESTIC ABUSE THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ABUSED BY PERSON(S) WITH WHOM THEY ARE OR HAVE BEEN LIVING. SERVICES WILL INCLUDE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT TO THE WHOLE FAMILY INCLUDING THE CHILDREN AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.