ASSOCIATION OF NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCHES IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET (BARNET BOROUGHWATCH (BBW))
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote the efficiency of the police and to promote good citizenship, enhance public safety and secure greater public participation in the prevention and solution of crime by facilitating an effective liason between the police, local authority and public
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 27 December 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Barnet
Llywodraethu
- 04 Mehefin 1997: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Ebrill 2017: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- BARNET BOROUGHWATCH (Enw gwaith)
- ASSOCIATION OF NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCHES IN THE BOROUGH OF BARNET (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 27/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £59.18k | £65.73k | £70.69k | £220 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £59.15k | £64.88k | £68.84k | £45 | £5.84k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 27 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 27 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 27 Rhagfyr 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 27 Rhagfyr 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 27 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 27 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 27 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 27 Rhagfyr 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 APRIL 1997, AS AMENDED ON 14 JUNE 2001 AND 19TH MARCH 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
BARNET, GREATER LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window