Dogfen lywodraethu LARKFIELD WITH HILL PARK AUTISTIC TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/1954 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING, PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES INCLUDING THOSE CONSIDERED TO BE ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM AND THOSE DISADVANTAGED IN SOCIETY BY ENHANCING THEIR INDEPENDENCE, POTENTIAL AND QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF STIMULATING, SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENTS, ACCOMMODATION, CARE AND PROGRAMMES OF TRAINING, EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.