Dogfen lywodraethu THE ABBEY SCHOOL, READING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 1914 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1940, 15 FEBRUARY 1960, 1 JULY 1996, 30 JUNE 2003, 31 JANUARY 2005 AND 4 DECEMBER 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/02/2016 AS AMENDED ON 21 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 MAR 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE SCHOOL IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 4.1 TO CARRY ON A SCHOOL (BOTH FOR DAY STUDENTS AND BOARDERS) PROVIDING OR IMPARTING AND DEVELOPING A LIBERAL, PRACTICAL AND GENERAL EDUCATION FOR GIRLS AND BOYS OF ALL CLASSES, TO INCLUDE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN THE DOCTRINES AND DUTIES OF CHRISTIANITY AS TAUGHT BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; AND 4.2 TO ESTABLISH, CONTROL AND MAINTAIN A BOARDING-HOUSE OR BOARDING-HOUSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCHOOL TO BOARDERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.