Trosolwg o’r elusen THE SALISBURY AND SOUTH WILTSHIRE MUSEUM
Rhif yr elusen: 289850-2
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
SCHEME DATED 16/12/1968
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11/11/1975
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/10/1984
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2010
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/11/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF SALISBURY FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF SPECIMENS OF THE FINE AND USEFUL ARTS, ETHONOLOGY, ARCHAEOLOGY, GEOLOGY, BOTANY AND NATURAL HISTORY. B. THE PROVISION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MUSEUM OF A LIBRARY, LECTURES AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION RELATING TO THOSE ARTS AND SCIENCES; AND C. THE PROVISION IN CONNECTION WITH THE MUSEUM OF RESEARCH RELATING TO THOSE ARTS AND SCIENCES. THE FRANK STEVENS BEQUEST - WILL PROVED 13TH APRIL 1950.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 06 Gorffenaf 1962: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- SALISBURY MUSEUM (Enw gwaith)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.