CENTRAL BUREAU FOR EDUCATIONAL VISITS AND EXCHANGES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Nid oes gwybodaeth ar gael am weithgareddau'r elusen.
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
Llywodraethu
- 24 Ebrill 1997: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 209131 THE BRITISH COUNCIL
- 14 Gorffennaf 1965: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Ebrill 1997: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 APRIL 1948 AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 23 NOVEMBER 1953, 21 DECEMBER 1960, 3 MAY 1965, 27 FEBRUARY 1974 AND 1 DECEMBER 1993
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVISE AND ASSIST SUCH PERSONS, OR BODIES OF PERSONS AS MAY BE CONSIDERED TO BE CONCERNED WITH THE EDUCATIONAL INTERESTS OF THE PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO EDUCATIONAL VISITS AND EXCHANGES BETWEEN THE SAID PEOPLE AND OTHER COMMUNITIES; (B) TO INFORM ITSELF OF THE ACTIVITIES OF AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH EXISTING AGENCIES BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES CONCERNED WITH SUCH EDUCATIONAL VISITS AND EXCHANGES; (C) TO SUPPLEMENT THE WORK OF ANY SUCH EXISTING AGENCIES AS FAR AS MAY BE DEEMED NECESSARY BY UNDERTAKING DIRECT RESPONSIBILITY FOR EDUCATIONAL VISITS AND EXCHANGES OR BY SECURING OR ASSISTING THE DEVELOPMENT OR ESTABLISHMENT OF OTHER SUITABLE AGENCIES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.