Dogfen lywodraethu THE MILL HILL SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 10.06.1869 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 06.09.1949,25.03.1969,20.06.1983, 08.10.1987, AND 29/7/1992. AS AMENDED BY ORDER UNDER SECTION 78 OF THE SEX DISCRIMINATION ACT 1975
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO PROVIDE OR AID IN PROVIDING FOR THE CHILDREN PROTESTANT EVANGELICAL DISSENTERS, A COURSE OF EDUCATION COMPRISING CLASSICS AND MATHEMATICS, AND OTHER SUBJECTS USUALLY TAUGHT IN SIMILAR SCHOOLS, COMBINED WITH GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND MORAL INSTRUCTION AND DISCIPLINE, BUT SO THAT THE SCHOOL SHALL NOT NECESSARILY BE CONFINED TO THE CHILDREN OF PROTESTANT DISSENTERS, BUT (AFTER APPLICATIONS FOR THE ADMISSION OF CHILDREN OF PROTESTANT DISSENTERS SHALL HAVE BEEN DEALT WITH) SHALL BE OPEN TO THE CHILDREN OF PARENTS PROFESSING OTHER RELIGIOUS TENETS WHO SHALL BE WILLING TO CONFORM TO THE REGULATIONS OF THE SCHOOL.
Maes buddion
NOT DENFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.