Dogfen lywodraethu Citizens Advice Central Nottinghamshire

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 DECEMBER 2003 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2022 as amended on 02 Jan 2024 as amended on 02 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically: to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Ashfield, Broxtowe, Newark and Sherwood and surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
THE BOROUGH OF BROXTOWE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.