Dogfen lywodraethu THE DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2014 as amended on 16 Mar 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE SUPPORT, PROMOTION AND DEVELOPMENT OF DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY AND RELATED AREAS IN ALL ITS BRANCHES BY THE COLLECTION, PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF MATERIAL CALCULATED TO PROVIDE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE MATERIAL, AND BY THE MOUNTING OF CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, EXHIBITIONS, AWARDS SCHEMES AND EDUCATIONAL COURSES IN DESIGN AND TECHNOLOGY AND ITS DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.