Dogfen lywodraethu BURNLEY PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/09/2011 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 09 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity is established for the following objects ("the Objects"): to promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the Community in the County of Lancashire hereinafter called the "area of benefit", and in particular the advancement of education, the preservation and protection of good health, the relief of poverty, distress and sickness, and to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreational and other leisure time activity with the object of improving conditions of life in the said community.
Maes buddion
LANCASHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.