Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY WIRRAL BRANCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2011 as amended on 10 May 2022 as amended on 21 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF THE WIRRAL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD, HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE DISTRICT” IN TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING, IN PARTICULAR BY: PRESERVING AND FURTHERING THE PRACTICE OF TRADITIONAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING INSTRUCTION IN THE DANCING OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCES PROMOTING THE ENJOYMENT AND APPRECIATION OF SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCING AND MUSIC BY ANY SUITABLE MEANS
Maes buddion
WIRRAL AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.