THE FORREST AND GRINSELL FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
mAKES EDUCATIONAL AWARDS
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Dinas Westminster
Llywodraethu
- 16 Tachwedd 2009: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 226936 WESTMINSTER ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
- 11 Rhagfyr 1969: Cofrestrwyd
- 16 Tachwedd 2009: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £37.43k | £41.02k | £41.73k | £38.32k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £37.47k | £43.73k | £61.45k | £56.08k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 13 Awst 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 01 Hydref 2008 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 17 Awst 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 20 Awst 2007 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 26 Hydref 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 29 Medi 2006 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 25 Hydref 2005 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2004 | 25 Hydref 2005 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1957 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 8 MARCH 1972 AND 29 APRIL 1991
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS NOT EXCEEDING 25 YEARS IN AGE, RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THOSE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER UNITED PARISHES OF ST. MARGARET AND ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, IN ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION, APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, TO BE AWARDED UNDER RULES TO BE MADE BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE EXHIBITIONS, AND THE QUALIFICATIONS, AND METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION, OF CANDIDATES; (B) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS; AND (D) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Maes buddion
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window