Dogfen lywodraethu THE CLOCKMAKERS' MUSEUM AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 312876
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/04/1972 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/10/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO HOLD ALL CHATTELS AND ARTICLES OR HOROLOGICAL OR LIKE INTEREST GIVEN, BEQUEATHED, LENT TO OR DEPOSITED WITH THE TRUSTEES UPON TRUST FOR THE COMPANY OF CLOCKMAKERS AS AN ACCRETION TO THE COLLECTION AND LIBRARY OF THE COMPANY AT GUILDHALL.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.