Dogfen lywodraethu HF TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10/9/62, AS AMENDED 28/4/1973,30/3/1974,5/4/1975,26/3/1977,31/3/1979, 27/3/1982, 22/3/1986, 31/3/1990, 23/3/1991, 28/3/1992, 26/09/1992, 20/9/1997, 20/9/2003, 25/9/2004, 17/9/2005, 26/09/2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 DEC 2018 as amended on 16 Oct 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ENABLE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES TO EXPERIENCE FULFILLING LIVES IN WAYS WHICH MAXIMISE THEIR INVOLVEMENT IN THE COMMUNITY AND PARTICIPATION AS CITIZENS, AND TO EXERCISE CHOICE. 2. TO OFFER ADVICE TO AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE WHO CARE FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.