Dogfen lywodraethu OPERATIONAL RESEARCH SOCIETY LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/05/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND INTEREST IN OPERATIONAL RESEARCH. B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN OPERATIONAL RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.