THE CHILDWICK TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Grants are given to charities in England to assist people with disabilities, the elderly in need plus adults and children who are seriously ill. The Trust also supports the welfare of people involved in the horseracing industry. The Trust also supports Jewish people in need within the UK and pre-school educational projects in South Africa.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Llundain Fwyaf
- De Affrica
Llywodraethu
- 05 Ionawr 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1150413 THE CHILDWICK TRUST
- 29 Gorffennaf 1985: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Ionawr 2015: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.29m | £1.85m | £1.99m | £1.72m | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £2.97m | £3.12m | £3.08m | £2.99m | £77.43m | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £69.27k | £95.87k | £160.76k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £2.22m | £1.75m | £1.81m | £1.57m | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | £0 | £21.77k | £147.93k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £2.86m | £2.76m | £2.73m | £2.65m | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £26.68k | £39.09k | £47.25k | £39.62k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £74.53k | £325.74k | £306.81k | £304.69k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 10 Tachwedd 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 25 Medi 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 07 Hydref 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2012 | 28 Medi 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2012 | 10 Hydref 2012 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2011 | 23 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2011 | 25 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SETTLEMENT DATED 10 APRIL 1985 AMENDED 24 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 23 MARCH 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ASSIST THE AGED IN NEED INCLUDING THE FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE SETTLER AND OF COMPANIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE SETTLER AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH FORMER EMPLOYEES. (B) TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO CHARITIES OR FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONNECTED WITH HORSE RACING OR HORSE BREEDING WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR PEOPLE INVOLVED WITH HORSE RACING OR HORSE BREEDING WHO SHALL BE IN NEED. (C) TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF JEWISH CHARITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE JEWISH FAITH OR SUPPORT OF JEWS IN NEED WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (D) TO SUPPORT CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF PEOPLE AND THE FAMILIES OF PEOPLE WHO INTEND TO WORK ARE WORKING OR HAVE WORKED IN THE MINING INDUSTRY IN THE REPUBLIC OF SOUTH AFRICA. (E) TO SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE RESIDENT IN SOUTH AFRICA AND TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS TO ASSIST THEM IN THEIR EDUCATION WHETHER IN SOUTH AFRICA OR ELSEWHERE. (F) TO MAKE PAYMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND PARTICULARLY FOR THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window