MIT DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
MIT Development Trust receives contributions from UK based donors and transfers them to the Massachusetts Institute of Technology in the USA in a tax efficient manner by the reclaimation of Gift Aid from the UK government
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Gogledd Iwerddon
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 15 Gorffennaf 1986: Cofrestrwyd
- 02 Medi 2016: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £48.21k | £71.54k | £88.40k | £168.83k | £88.72k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £48.17k | £68.51k | £88.40k | £189.51k | £94.85k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 03 Medi 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 03 Medi 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 14 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 14 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | 03 Medi 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | 03 Medi 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUNE 1986
Gwrthrychau elusennol
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND, SUBJECT TO THE TERMS ON WHICH ANY SPECIAL DONATION IS RECIEVED UNDER SUB-CLAUSE (C) OF CLAUSE 9 HEREOF, TO OR FOR:- A THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF SUCH OF THE PURPOSES OF MIT AS ARE CHARITABLE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH LAW BY WAY OF GIFT, GRANT, LOAN, GUARANTEE OR SUCH OTHER FORM OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FOR THE MAINTENANCE, EXPANSION AND DEVELOPMENT OF MIT AND ITS ACTIVITIES CALCULATED TO ACHIEVE SUCH PURPOSES, OR B SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TERM IS UNDERSTOOD IN ENGLISH LAW CONNECTED WITH MIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window