Dogfen lywodraethu THE GUILLAIN-BARRE SYNDROME SUPPORT GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1985, AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 1986, 28 APRIL 1990, 22 APRIL 1995,1 APRIL 2000, 12 APRIL 2003, 22 APRIL 2006, 26 APRIL 2008 AND BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE CONDITIONS VARIOUSLY KNOWN AS GUILLAIN BARRE SYNDROME, ACUTE IDIOPATHIC POLYNEURITIS, OR ACUTE OR CHRONIC INFLAMMATORY POLYRADICULONEUROPATHY OR THEIR COGNATES (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "GBS") IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND AND OF THEIR FAMILIES, AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF CARE, COUNSELLING, INFORMATION, NON-MEDICAL ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO SUFFERERS AND THEIR FAMILIES (B) PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF GBS AND (C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION CONCERNING GBS, ITS CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND REPUBLIC OF IRELAND.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.