Dogfen lywodraethu GEESE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 AUG 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 AUG 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO AID REHABILITATION, PREVENT RECIDIVISM AND CRIMINAL ACTIVITY AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SUPPORT OF PRISONERS, THOSE ON PROBATION, EX-OFFENDERS AND OTHERS WHO MAY BE CONSIDERED SOCIALLY VULNERABLE AND/ OR MARGINAL AND/ OR AT RISK, AS WELL AS THOSE WORKING WITH THESE GROUPS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THEATRICAL PERFORMANCES AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.