Dogfen lywodraethu THE WINGATE SPECIAL CHILDRENS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/01/1988 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1992 AS AMENDED ON 14/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 19/10/2011 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ENHANCE AND SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS WITH COMPLEX NEEDS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND PEOPLE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY, BOTH LOCALLY AND NATIONALLY, IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATON AND LEISURE TIME WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 2) TO ADVANCE BOTH THE EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING AND DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS WITH COMPLEX NEEDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES, SHORT BREAKS AND ASSISTANCE IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE AND IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.