Dogfen lywodraethu ECTARC LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/01/1997 AS AMENDED 13/12/2001 AS AMENDED 03/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PROMOTION WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF EDUCATION ABOUT AND IN TRADITIONAL AND REGIONAL CULTURES OF EUROPE BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS RELATING THERETO INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC, BALLET, SINGING DRAMA AND DANCING.
Maes buddion
THE REGIONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN EUROPE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.