Dogfen lywodraethu THE BACTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 16/05/1990 AS AMENDED ON 30/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 13/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2019 as amended on 26 Nov 2020 as amended on 25 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PERSONS, WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE RESIDENT OR TEMPORARILY LOCATED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.