Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND -
Rhif yr elusen: 1053793-37
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION, SO FAR AS MAY BE PERMISSIBLE, THE CAPITAL FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE COMMUNITY SERVICE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 27 Tachwedd 1996: Cofrestrwyd
- 30 Gorffennaf 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Enwau eraill
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS COMMUNITY NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON NHS TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH GENERAL (Enw blaenorol)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY SERVICE FUND (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.