Trosolwg o'r elusen ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 1053793-39
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1996
AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/11/2000
AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 13/03/2005
AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/03/2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY WITHIN THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 29 Tachwedd 1996: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON MENTAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PARTNERSHIP NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Enw blaenorol)
- BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON COMMUNITY NHS TRUST GENERAL FUND (Enw blaenorol)
- SOUTH BEDFORDSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH TRUST GENERAL (Enw blaenorol)
- SOUTH ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.