Dogfen lywodraethu HASCAS HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE ADVISORY SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO DEVELOP AN ADVISORY EDUCATIONAL AND CONSULTANCY SERVICE TO IMPROVE THE DELIVERY OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE MENTALLY ILL, PEOPLE WHO ARE OR ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT ON ILLEGAL DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, ALCOHOL, SOLVENTS OR OTHER ADDICTIVE SUBSTANCES, AND ELDERLY PEOPLE
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.