Dogfen lywodraethu SARCOIDOSISUK
Rhif yr elusen: 1063986

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOV 1996 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 27 MAR 2017 as amended on 21 May 2018 as amended on 18 Jul 2019 as amended on 18 Jul 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM SARCOIDOSIS AND INTERSTITIAL LUNG CONDITION AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THESE CONDITIONS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
GREATER LONDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.