THE OLD ROEDEANIANS SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Fund was established over 90 years ago to assist present pupils who have been at the School for at least two years, Old Roedeanians and their daughters, granddaughters and great-granddaughters. There is a preference for pupils at the School who are studying at Sixth Form level. The Award is means-tested, and Award holders are selected by the School.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Dwyrain Sussex
Llywodraethu
- 03 Rhagfyr 1997: Cofrestrwyd
- OLD ROEDEANIANS' ASSOCIATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Enw gwaith)
- Buddsoddi
- Rheoli risg
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robina Coker | Cadeirydd | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Henderson | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Laura Challen | Ymddiriedolwr | 11 January 2010 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.91k | £14.90k | £6.15k | £4.50k | £6.30k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.93k | £4.58k | £10.48k | £12.36k | £10.55k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 23 Rhagfyr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 28 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 28 Tachwedd 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 05 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 25 Mehefin 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME SEALED 27TH JUNE 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE PURPOSES OF PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING ) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND; (A) ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED AS A PUPIL AT ROEDEAN SCHOOL, BRIGHTON, IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX (THE SCHOOL), OR (B) ARE CHILDREN, GRANDCHILDREN OR GREAT GRANDCHILDREN OF A FORMER PUPIL OF THE SCHOOL WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL WHO ARE STUDYING AT SIXTH FORM LEVEL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING- (1) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; (11) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. WITHIN THE LIMITS PRESCRIBED BY THIS SCHEME THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE FULL POWER TO MAKE RULES FOR THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES AND OTHER BENEFITS, INCLUDING RULES AS TO THE VALUE AND PERIOD OF TENURE OF THE AWARDS AND QUALIFICATIONS, METHOD OF ASCERTAINMENT AND SELECTION OF CANDIDATES FOR BENEFIT. (2) IF THE TRUSTEES ARE UNABLE TO APPLY ALL OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE ABOVE-MENTIONED PURPOSES IN ANY ONE YEAR THEY MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR THE SAME PURPOSES IN THE FOLLOWING YEAR.
Maes buddion
BRIGHTON
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
99 E
Cambridge Street
Pimlico
London
SW1V 4PY
- Ffôn:
- 07816918873
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window