Dogfen lywodraethu DUDLEY HIV AND AIDS SUPPORT GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1995, 16 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 19 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE C.C. DATED 12 OCTOBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST WITHIN THE BLACK COUNTRY: 2.1) THE SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY THE HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS(HIV), AIDS AND RELATED CONDITIONS INCLUDING THE EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL, SPIRITUAL AND EMOTIONAL WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR PARTNERS, RELATIVES AND FRIENDS WHO MAY ALSO BE AFFECTED BY THESE CONDITIONS; AND 2.2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL MATTERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE PREVENTION AND EFFECTS OF HIV AND AIDS
Maes buddion
DUDLEY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.