Dogfen lywodraethu HELMSLEY WALLED GARDEN LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 OCTOBER 1998 AND 14 JANUARY 1999 as amended on 25 Jun 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2024 as amended on 13 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance the education of the public in all matters relating to horticulture, gardening skills and therapeutic horticulture through the development and maintenance of an historic walled garden, providing a supportive therapeutic space for volunteers and enhancing the physical and emotional health and wellbeing of everyone who uses and visits the garden.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.