Dogfen lywodraethu CHILDREN'S LIVER DISEASE FOUNDATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/2013 as amended on 25 Mar 2021 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO UNDERTAKE AND PROMOTE MEDICAL AND SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH RELATING TO PAEDIATRIC LIVER DISORDERS AND SUBJECTS RELATIVE THERETO. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF PAEDIATRIC LIVER DISEASES AND DISORDERS, THEIR CAUSES, DIAGNOSES AND TREATMENT. 3) TO PROMOTE HEALTH EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO THE PEADATRIC LIVER. 4) TO PROMOTE SUCH RESEARCH AS IS MENTIONED IN CLAUSE 3(A). FOR FURTHER INFORMATION PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 3.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.