Dogfen lywodraethu OAKLEAF ENTERPRISE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/06/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 MAY 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT PERSONS WITH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES, INCLUDING THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, BY THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF OCCUPATIONAL TRAINING FACILITIES AND COUNSELLING; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WITH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING.
Maes buddion
SURREY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.