Dogfen lywodraethu TOOGOODTOWASTE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 DEC 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 JUL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUL 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2017 as amended on 14 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ASSIST WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY HELPING TO MEET THE FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD NEEDS OF PEOPLE ON LOW INCOME BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, RECYCLING FURNITURE WHICH WOULD OTHERWISE BE THROWN AWAY AND ADVANCING MORE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTISES 2) TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF PEOPLE BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO VOLUNTEER AND TO TRAIN, SO AS TO DEVELOP WORK SKILLS AND SOCIAL SKILLS, GAIN WORK EXPERIENCE AND ENCOURAGE SOCIAL INTEGRATION
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.