Dogfen lywodraethu SERVICES FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/02/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILY CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION AND PROMOTION OF SERVICES WHICH FOSTER INDEPENDENT LIVING AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, AND WHICH ASSIST DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILY CARERS TO ACTIVELY PARTICIPATE IN AND INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.