Dogfen lywodraethu THE GENDER IDENTITY RESEARCH EDUCATION SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1997, AMENDED 29 JANUARY 1998, 15 JULY 2001 AND 11 OCTOBER 2009. as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 27 Oct 2019 as amended on 23 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are to advance education regarding all forms of gender identity and intersex issues, and in particular: i. To initiate, promote and support research particularly to address the needs of those whose gender identity does not correspond with assumptions made at birth; ii. To publish the outcome of such research and other relevant information in order to inform interested parties and the general public; and iii. To achieve a wider understanding of these issues and thereby enable equal participation within society of those who experience them.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.